There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (11)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

AGOA and MCA Modernization Act
African Growth and Opportunity Act and Millennium Challenge Act Modernization Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

AGOA and MCA Modernization Act
African Growth and Opportunity Act and Millennium Challenge Act Modernization Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

AGOA and MCA Modernization Act
African Growth and Opportunity Act and Millennium Challenge Act Modernization Act

Short Titles as Introduced

AGOA and MCA Modernization Act
African Growth and Opportunity Act and Millennium Challenge Act Modernization Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

AGOA and MCA Modernization Act
African Growth and Opportunity Act and Millennium Challenge Act Modernization Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To enhance the transparency and accelerate the impact of programs under the African Growth and Opportunity Act and the Millennium Challenge Corporation, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
04/23/2018Became Public Law No: 115-167. (TXT | PDF)
04/23/2018Signed by President.
04/11/2018Presented to President.
04/09/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2015)
01/17/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H430-432)
01/03/2018Reported by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 115-484.
07/27/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
04/23/2018Became Public Law No: 115-167. (TXT | PDF)
04/23/2018Signed by President.
04/11/2018HousePresented to President.
04/10/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/09/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2015)
02/06/2018SenateRead twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 304.
01/18/2018SenateReceived in the Senate.
01/17/2018-2:20pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/17/2018-2:20pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H430-432)
01/17/2018-1:58pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3445.
01/17/2018-1:58pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H430-435)
01/17/2018-1:58pmHouseMr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
01/03/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 358.
01/03/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 115-484.
09/28/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/28/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
07/27/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
07/27/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs07/27/2017 Referred to
09/28/2017 Markup by
01/03/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-484

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3445. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-167 (04/23/2018)

African Growth and Opportunity Act and Millennium Challenge Act Modernization Act or the AGOA and MCA Modernization Act

This bill directs the President to establish a website for the collection and dissemination of information regarding the African Growth and Opportunity Act (AGOA).

The Department of State is urged to promote the use by eligible sub-Saharan African countries of the benefits available under the African Growth and Opportunity Act.

The President is urged to:

  • facilitate trans-boundary trade among eligible sub-Saharan African countries;
  • provide training for business and government trade officials on accessing AGOA benefits;
  • provide capacity building for African entrepreneurs and trade associations on production strategies, quality standards, and market development;
  • provide capacity building training to promote product diversification and value-added processing; and
  • provide capacity building and technical assistance funding to help African businesses and institutions comply with U.S. counter-terrorism policies.

The Millennium Challenge Act of 2003 is amended to permit an eligible country that has entered into a Millennium Challenge Compact to enter into one additional concurrent compact under specified conditions. Regarding a subsequent nonconcurrent compact, a country's eligibility shall be based on significantly improved performance across the criteria relevant to selection for the preceding compact.

The bill establishes, beginning with FY2013, new assistance criteria for a low-income or a lower middle income candidate country eligible to enter into a Millennium Challenge Compact with the United States.

The Millennium Challenge Corporation shall: (1) before selecting a compact country, provide the Board of Directors with information regarding the country's treatment of civil society; and (2) submit an assessment of the feasibility of developing partnerships at the sub-national level within candidate countries.