There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Background Check Completion Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit firearms dealers from selling a firearm prior to the completion of a background check.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/27/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
02/27/2018Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Clyburn. Petition No: 115-7. (Discharge petition text with signatures.)
Action By: House of Representatives
09/06/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/27/2017Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/27/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (101)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 07/27/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/27/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 07/27/2017
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 07/27/2017
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 07/27/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/27/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 07/27/2017
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 07/27/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/27/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 07/27/2017
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 07/27/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 07/27/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 07/27/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 07/27/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 07/27/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 07/27/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 07/27/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/27/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/27/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/27/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 07/27/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 07/27/2017
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 10/04/2017
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/04/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 11/16/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 11/16/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 11/16/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 11/16/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 11/16/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 11/16/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 11/16/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 11/16/2017
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/16/2017
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 11/16/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 11/16/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 11/16/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 11/16/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 11/16/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 12/11/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 12/11/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 12/11/2017
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 02/26/2018
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 02/26/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 02/26/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 02/26/2018
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 02/26/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/26/2018
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 02/26/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 02/26/2018
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/26/2018
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 02/26/2018
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/26/2018
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/26/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 02/26/2018
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/26/2018
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 02/27/2018
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 02/27/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/27/2018
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 02/27/2018
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/27/2018
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/27/2018
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 02/27/2018
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 02/27/2018
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 02/27/2018
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 02/27/2018
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 02/27/2018
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 02/27/2018
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 02/27/2018
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 03/05/2018
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/05/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 03/05/2018
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 03/05/2018
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 03/05/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 03/05/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 03/05/2018
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/05/2018
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/05/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/05/2018
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 03/05/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 03/05/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 03/05/2018
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/05/2018
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4] 03/05/2018
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 03/05/2018
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 03/08/2018
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 03/08/2018
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/08/2018
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/14/2018
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/14/2018
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 03/14/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/22/2018
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/13/2018
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 04/13/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 04/13/2018
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/05/2018
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/05/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/05/2018
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/10/2018
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 07/10/2018
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/10/2018
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 07/23/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/27/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations09/06/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3464. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/27/2017)

Background Check Completion Act of 2017

This bill amends the federal criminal code to prohibit a licensed gun dealer from transferring a firearm to an unlicensed person prior to completion of a background check. (Current law permits a licensed gun dealer to transfer a firearm to an unlicensed person if a submitted background check remains incomplete after three business days.)