There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Modernization of Medical Records Access for Veterans Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to carry out a pilot program establishing a secure, patient-centered, portable medical records system, that would allow veterans to have access to their Personal Health Information, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/27/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
03/07/2018Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations
07/27/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/27/2017Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/27/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (63)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 07/27/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 09/05/2017
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 09/05/2017
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 09/07/2017
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 09/07/2017
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/07/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/07/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 09/11/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 09/11/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 09/11/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 09/11/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 09/12/2017
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large] 09/12/2017
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 09/12/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 09/12/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/12/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 09/12/2017
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 09/12/2017
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/12/2017
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/12/2017
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/18/2017
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 09/18/2017
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 09/18/2017
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 09/21/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/21/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/21/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 09/21/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 09/21/2017
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 09/21/2017
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 09/25/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 10/02/2017
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 10/02/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 10/02/2017
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/04/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 10/04/2017
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 10/05/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 10/05/2017
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 10/05/2017
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 10/11/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/11/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 10/11/2017
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 10/11/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/19/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 10/31/2017
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 10/31/2017
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 11/06/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 11/16/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 01/29/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 01/30/2018
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 02/05/2018
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 02/07/2018
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 02/07/2018
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/07/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 02/13/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/14/2018
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/01/2018
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 03/01/2018
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 03/06/2018
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/06/2018
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 03/26/2018
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 03/26/2018
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 05/15/2018
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 06/05/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs07/27/2017 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations07/27/2017 Referred to
03/07/2018 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.3497.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3497. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/27/2017)

Modernization of Medical Records Access for Veterans Act of 2017

This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to carry out in at least one Veterans Integrated Services Network a pilot program for at least a 12-month period during which veterans enrolled in the VA's patient enrollment system will use a portable medical records storage system to store and share with VA health care providers and community health care providers records of their individual medical histories.

The VA shall seek to enter into a contract, using competitive procedures, with an appropriate entity to furnish such storage system.

The bill specifies system requirements, including: (1) the capability to store at least four gigabytes of electronic health records on a physical device no larger than a credit card, and (2) the capability to be used by substantially all electronic health records systems certified by the Office of the National Coordinator for Health IT on or before January 1, 2017.