There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.353. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/06/2017)

Weather Research and Forecasting Innovation Act of 2017

This bill authorizes a number of programs to enhance weather forecasting and alerts at the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA).

NOAA's Office of Oceanic and Atmospheric Research must conduct a program to improve forecasting of weather events and their effects, with a special focus on high impact weather events.

The National Weather Service must collect and utilize information to make reliable and timely foundational forecasts of subseasonal and seasonal temperature and precipitation. Subseasonal forecasting is forecasting weather between two weeks and three months and seasonal forecasting is between three months and two years.

The bill provides for technology transfers between the National Weather Service and private sector weather companies and universities to improve forecasting.

NOAA must complete and operationalize the Constellation Observing System for Meteorology, Ionosphere, and Climate (a weather satellite program which develops observational techniques using global navigation systems).

Additionally, NOAA may contract with the private sector to obtain data for weather forecasting.

NOAA must continue its Environmental Information Services Working Group, which advises NOAA on weather research and opportunities to improve communications between weather stakeholders.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
04/18/2017 Became Public Law No: 115-25.
04/18/2017 Signed by President.
04/06/2017 Presented to President.
04/04/2017 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.(consideration: CR H2653-2667; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H2653-2663)
03/29/2017 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
01/09/2017 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H208-214)
01/06/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
04/18/2017 Became Public Law No: 115-25.
04/18/2017 Signed by President.
04/06/2017 House Presented to President.
04/04/2017-3:06pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/04/2017-3:06pm House On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (consideration: CR H2653-2667; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H2653-2663)
04/04/2017-2:33pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the Senate amendment to H.R. 353.
04/04/2017-2:32pm House Mr. Smith (TX) moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment.
03/30/2017 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
03/29/2017 Senate Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
03/29/2017 Senate S.Amdt.204 Amendment SA 204 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
03/29/2017 Senate S.Amdt.205 Amendment SA 205 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
03/29/2017 Senate S.Amdt.205 Amendment SA 205 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Cantwell to Amendment SA 204. (consideration: CR S2116)
03/29/2017 Senate S.Amdt.204 Amendment SA 204 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Thune. (consideration: CR S2116)
03/29/2017 Senate Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S2115-2116)
01/10/2017 Senate Received in the Senate, read twice.
01/09/2017-5:26pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/09/2017-5:26pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H208-214)
01/09/2017-5:08pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 353.
01/09/2017-5:08pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H208-217)
01/09/2017-5:08pm House Mr. Lucas moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
01/06/2017 House Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
01/06/2017 House Introduced in House

Titles (7)

Short Titles:

Short Titles as Enacted:

Weather Research and Forecasting Innovation Act of 2017

Short Titles as Enacted for portions of this bill:
  • Tsunami Warning, Education, and Research Act of 2017

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House:

Weather Research and Forecasting Innovation Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced:

Weather Research and Forecasting Innovation Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate:

Weather Research and Forecasting Innovation Act of 2017

Short Titles as Passed Senate for portions of this bill:
  • Tsunami Warning, Education, and Research Act of 2017

Official Titles:

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced:

To improve the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration's weather research through a focused program of investment on affordable and attainable advances in observational, computing, and modeling capabilities to support substantial improvement in weather forecasting and prediction of high impact weather events, to expand commercial opportunities for the provision of weather data, and for other purposes.


Subjects (15)

  • Advisory bodies
  • Atmospheric science and weather
  • Computers and information technology
  • Emergency communications systems
  • Executive Office of the President
  • Executive agency funding and structure
  • Government information and archives
  • Natural disasters
  • Public contracts and procurement
  • Research administration and funding
  • Research and development
  • Spacecraft and satellites
  • Student aid and college costs
  • Technology transfer and commercialization

Cosponsors (6)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science, Space, and Technology01/06/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (2)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.