There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Industrial Hemp Farming Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Controlled Substances Act to exclude industrial hemp from the definition of marihuana, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/28/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
09/06/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
08/04/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/28/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/28/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/28/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 07/28/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5] 08/01/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 09/21/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 09/28/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 09/28/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/28/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/28/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 09/28/2017
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 09/28/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/28/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 09/28/2017
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 10/02/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/02/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/03/2017
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 10/03/2017
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 10/10/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/26/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 11/03/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/03/2017
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 11/07/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 11/16/2017
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 11/16/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 11/30/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 11/30/2017
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/21/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 02/15/2018
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/15/2018
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 02/15/2018
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 03/08/2018
Rep. Lewis, Jason [R-MN-2] 05/22/2018
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2] 05/22/2018
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/25/2018
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/25/2018
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 10/30/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce07/28/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health08/04/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary07/28/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations09/06/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3530.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3530. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/28/2017)

Industrial Hemp Farming Act of 2017

This bill limits the regulation of industrial hemp and research hemp under the Controlled Substances Act (CSA).

Specifically, the bill excludes industrial hemp and research hemp from the definition of marijuana under the CSA.

The Drug Enforcement Administration may conduct administrative inspections of places where industrial hemp or research hemp is produced, stored, distributed, or used.