There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Defund Planned Parenthood Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for a moratorium on Federal funding to Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/06/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
01/25/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/06/2017 Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/06/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (144)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 01/06/2017
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 01/06/2017
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/06/2017
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 01/11/2017
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 01/11/2017
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19] 01/11/2017
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 01/11/2017
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3] 01/11/2017
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 01/24/2017
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 01/31/2017
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/31/2017
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 02/01/2017
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/15/2017
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 03/15/2017
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19] 03/23/2017
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/25/2017
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/16/2017
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 05/16/2017
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 10/02/2017
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 01/25/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/06/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health01/25/2017 Referred to

As of 02/19/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.354 - Defund Planned Parenthood Act of 2017.


Subjects (7)

  • Abortion
  • Family planning and birth control
  • Health facilities and institutions
  • Health programs administration and funding
  • Sex and reproductive health
  • Women's health

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.354. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/06/2017)

Defund Planned Parenthood Act of 2017

This bill prohibits, for a one-year period, the availability of federal funds for any purpose to Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., or any of its affiliates or clinics, unless they certify that the affiliates and clinics will not perform, and will not provide any funds to any other entity that performs, an abortion during such period. This restriction does not apply in cases of rape or incest or where a physical condition endangers a woman's life unless an abortion is performed.

The Department of Health and Human Services and the Department of Agriculture must seek repayment of federal assistance received by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., or any affiliate or clinic, if it violates the terms of the certification required by this bill.

Additional funding for community health centers is provided for the one-year period described above.