There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

C-TPAT Reauthorization Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

C-TPAT Reauthorization Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Security and Accountability for Every Port Act of 2006 to reauthorize the Customs-Trade Partnership Against Terrorism Program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
10/23/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 402 - 1 (Roll no. 569).(text: CR H8052-8055)
09/25/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-323.
07/28/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/24/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
10/23/2017-6:54pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/23/2017-6:54pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 402 - 1 (Roll no. 569). (text: CR H8052-8055)
10/23/2017-6:30pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8062)
10/23/2017-5:00pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
10/23/2017-4:52pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3551.
10/23/2017-4:52pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8052-8056)
10/23/2017-4:52pmHouseMs. McSally moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/25/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 233.
09/25/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-323.
09/07/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
09/07/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
09/07/2017HouseSubcommittee on Border and Maritime Security Discharged.
08/29/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
07/28/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
07/28/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Homeland Security07/28/2017 Referred to
09/07/2017 Markup by
09/25/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-323
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security08/29/2017 Referred to
09/07/2017 Discharged from
Senate Finance10/24/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3551.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3551. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (09/25/2017)

C-TPAT Reauthorization Act of 2017

This bill amends the Security and Accountability for Every Port Act of 2006 to reauthorize within U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP) the Customs-Trade Partnership Against Terrorism (C-TPAT) program. The CBP shall publish on its website or other online publication: (1) information about benefits to program participants, and (2) notice of any changes to benefits to participants by 30 days before any such changes take effect.

The bill specifies that: (1) applicants may be eligible to participate as Tier 1 or Tier 2 participants, (2) importers may be eligible to participate as Tier 3 participants, and (3) the Executive Assistant Commissioner may extend Tier 3 participation to other entity types if appropriate. To be eligible, an entity shall: (1) have a designated company employee authorized to bind such entity that is a direct company employee and will serve as the primary point of contact responsible for participation; and (2) at the time of initial application and annually thereafter, submit an international supply chain security profile.

The CBP must establish minimum security criteria for participants in the program, review such minimum security criteria at least once every two years, and update such minimum security criteria as necessary.

The CBP may recognize regulatory inspections conducted by other components of the Department of Homeland Security of entities as sufficient to constitute validation for C-TPAT program participation. It shall: (1) implement a recertification process for all C-TPAT program participants, (2) consider the potential for participation in the C-TPAT program by importers of non-containerized cargoes and non-asset-based third party logistics providers, and (3) establish sufficient internal quality controls and record management to support the management systems of the C-TPAT program.