There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to furnish assistance for adaptations of residences of veterans in rehabilitation programs under chapter 31 of such title, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
06/01/2018Became Public Law No: 115-177.
06/01/2018Signed by President.
05/21/2018Presented to President.
05/16/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
05/16/2018Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2732)
11/06/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 400 - 0 (Roll no. 607).(text: CR H8502-8503)
11/06/2017Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-386.
07/28/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
06/01/2018Became Public Law No: 115-177.
06/01/2018Signed by President.
05/21/2018HousePresented to President.
05/17/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/16/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
05/16/2018SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2732)
11/07/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
11/06/2017-6:54pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/06/2017-6:54pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 400 - 0 (Roll no. 607). (text: CR H8502-8503)
11/06/2017-6:30pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8509)
11/06/2017-4:40pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
11/06/2017-4:30pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3562.
11/06/2017-4:30pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8502-8504)
11/06/2017-4:30pmHouseMr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/06/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 283.
11/06/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-386.
10/12/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
10/12/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/28/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/28/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
07/28/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2]* 07/28/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs07/28/2017 Referred to
10/12/2017 Markup by
11/06/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-386
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity07/28/2017 Referred to
Senate Veterans' Affairs11/07/2017 Referred to
05/16/2018 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.3562.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.3562. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-177 (06/01/2018)

(Sec. 1) This bill authorizes the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to assist a veteran with a service-connected disability who is in the vocational rehabilitation and employment program to acquire necessary residential adaptations. Such assistance may not be provided if it would result in a duplication of benefits.

The aggregate amount of assistance available to a veteran may not exceed $77,307. The VA may waive this limitation if necessary for a veteran's rehabilitation program. The VA shall: (1) increase assistance limits annually, and (2) beginning on October 1, 2019, submit a biennial report on the use of such waiver authority.

The VA is not required to provide mortgage life insurance to an individual under the age of 70 with a service-connected disability who receives adaptive residential assistance under this bill.