There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend chapter 44 of title 18, United States Code, to more comprehensively address the interstate transportation of firearms or ammunition.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/06/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/06/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/06/2017 Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/06/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (73)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/06/2017
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 01/09/2017
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/09/2017
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 01/09/2017
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/10/2017
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 01/10/2017
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/10/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3] 01/11/2017
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/13/2017
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/13/2017
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 01/27/2017
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 01/27/2017
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8] 01/31/2017
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 01/31/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 02/06/2017
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 04/24/2017
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11] 05/18/2017
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 05/18/2017
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 05/18/2017
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 05/22/2017
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 05/24/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/24/2017
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 05/24/2017
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 05/24/2017
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/24/2017
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 05/24/2017
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/24/2017
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 05/24/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/24/2017
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 06/02/2017
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 06/02/2017
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/06/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/06/2017
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/06/2017
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/06/2017
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 06/06/2017
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 06/06/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 06/07/2017
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 06/07/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 06/08/2017
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 06/12/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 06/15/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/15/2017
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/15/2017
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/26/2017
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 06/26/2017
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 07/27/2017
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 07/27/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/25/2017
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 11/08/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/06/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations02/06/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (5)

  • Criminal procedure and sentencing
  • Firearms and explosives
  • Legal fees and court costs
  • Motor vehicles

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.358. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/06/2017)

This bill amends the federal criminal code to revise provisions related to the interstate transportation of firearms and ammunition.

An individual may transport a firearm between two places (e.g., states) where it is legal to possess, carry, or transport the firearm. During transport, the firearm must be unloaded and secured or securely stored.

Additionally, an individual may transport ammunition, or a detachable magazine or feeding device, between two places where it is legal to possess, carry, or transport the ammunition, magazine, or feeding device. During transport, the ammunition, magazine, or feeding device must not be loaded into a firearm and must be securely stored.

This bill prohibits the arrest or detention of an individual for a state or local firearm or ammunition violation unless there is probable cause to believe the individual failed to comply with the provisions of this bill.