There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

RED SNAPPER Act
Regionally Empowered Decision-making for Snapper, Noting the Angling Public and the Preservation of an Exceptional Resource Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Magnuson-Stevens Fishery Conservation and Management Act to provide for management of red snapper in the Gulf of Mexico, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/28/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
12/13/2017 Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 16.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/13/2017 Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/12/2017 Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/12/2017 Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/26/2017 Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans
08/17/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/28/2017 Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/28/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources07/28/2017 Referred to
12/13/2017 Markup by
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans08/17/2017 Referred to
09/26/2017 Hearings by
12/12/2017 Discharged from

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.