There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Securing Our Borders and Wilderness Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Securing Our Borders and Wilderness Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Wilderness Act to authorize U.S. Customs and Border Protection to conduct certain activities to secure the international land borders of the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/10/2018Committee on Homeland Security discharged.
12/10/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1070, Part I.
07/28/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date
12/10/2018Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 831.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/10/2018Committee on Homeland Security discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/10/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1070, Part I.
11/15/2018Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 12.
11/15/2018Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
11/15/2018Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
08/29/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
08/15/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/28/2017Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/28/2017Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/28/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources07/28/2017 Referred to
11/15/2018 Markup by
12/10/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-1070
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands08/15/2017 Referred to
11/15/2018 Discharged from
House Homeland Security07/28/2017 Referred to
12/10/2018 Discharged from
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security08/29/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3593.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3593. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/28/2017)

Securing Our Borders and Wilderness Act

This bill amends the Wilderness Act to allow the U.S. Customs and Border Protection to conduct the following activities within a wilderness area for the purpose of securing the international land borders of the United States:

  • access structures, installations, and roads;
  • use motor vehicles and aircraft;
  • deploy temporary infrastructure in response to emergencies; or
  • construct and maintain roads and fences, subject to the approval of the Department of the Interior.

Any such activity shall be carried out in a manner that protects the wilderness character of the area.