There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Secretary of the Interior to establish fees for medical services provided in units of the National Park System, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
04/16/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3320)
02/15/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-565.
07/28/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
12/12/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks
04/17/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
04/16/2018-5:06pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/16/2018-5:06pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3320)
04/16/2018-5:00pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3607.
04/16/2018-5:00pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3320-3321)
04/16/2018-5:00pmHouseMr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
02/15/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 426.
02/15/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-565.
11/30/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
11/30/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
11/29/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
11/29/2017HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
10/11/2017HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands
08/17/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/28/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
07/28/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 07/28/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources07/28/2017 Referred to
11/30/2017 Markup by
02/15/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-565
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands08/17/2017 Referred to
10/11/2017 Hearings by
11/29/2017 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources04/17/2018 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks12/12/2018 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3607. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/28/2017)

This bill authorizes the Department of the Interior to establish and collect fees for medical services provided to persons in units of the National Park System.

The bill establishes the National Park Medical Services Fund, to consist of donations and the fees collected for such services and to be available to Interior for:

  • providing such services;
  • preparing programmatic analyses and developing management plans for medical facilities, equipment, vehicles, and other needs for, and costs of, such services;
  • providing training related to furnishing such services; and
  • obtaining or improving medical facilities, equipment, vehicles, and other needs and costs of such services.