There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Safer Neighborhoods Gun Buyback Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Director of the Bureau of Justice Assistance to make grants to States, units of local government, and gun dealers to conduct gun buyback programs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/28/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
09/06/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/28/2017Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/28/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/28/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/23/2018
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/23/2018
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/23/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 02/23/2018
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 02/23/2018
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 02/26/2018
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 02/26/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 02/26/2018
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 02/26/2018
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 03/01/2018
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/01/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/01/2018
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/01/2018
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 03/06/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 03/06/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 03/07/2018
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 05/03/2018
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 05/03/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/03/2018
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 05/10/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary07/28/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations09/06/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3613.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3613. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/28/2017)

Safer Neighborhoods Gun Buyback Act of 2017

This bill authorizes the Department of Justice's Bureau of Justice Assistance (BJA) to make grants to states, local governments, or gun dealers to conduct gun buyback programs. The BJA may distribute smart prepaid cards for use by a state, local government, or gun dealer to compensate individuals who dispose of firearms.

Additionally, the bill amends the federal criminal code to make it a crime to use or accept a smart prepaid card in the acquisition or transfer of a firearm or ammunition. A violator is subject to a fine, up to two years in prison, or both.