There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

PACE Act
Promoting Affordable Childcare for Everyone Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to make the Child and Dependent Care Tax Credit fully refundable, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/28/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
07/28/2017Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/28/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 09/13/2017
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 09/13/2017
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 09/13/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 09/13/2017
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 09/13/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 09/13/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 09/14/2017
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 09/18/2017
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/18/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 09/18/2017
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 09/18/2017
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 09/18/2017
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 09/18/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 09/18/2017
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 09/18/2017
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 09/18/2017
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 09/18/2017
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 09/27/2017
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2] 09/27/2017
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 09/28/2017
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/28/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/03/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 10/04/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 10/04/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 10/04/2017
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 10/06/2017
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 10/06/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 10/11/2017
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2] 10/24/2017
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 10/24/2017
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 10/25/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 10/25/2017
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 10/25/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/25/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 10/27/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 10/27/2017
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 10/31/2017
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 10/31/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 11/01/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 11/01/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 11/08/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 11/08/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/30/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 12/15/2017
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 12/15/2017
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 04/24/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means07/28/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3632. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/28/2017)

Promoting Affordable Childcare for Everyone Act or the PACE Act

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code, with respect to the tax credit for expenses for household and dependent care services necessary for gainful employment (known as the Child and Dependent Care Tax Credit), to: (1) make the credit refundable, (2) increase the rate for the credit, and (3) require the dollar amounts for such credit to be adjusted for inflation after 2017.

The bill also increases the amount of employer-provided dependent care assistance which may be excluded from the gross income of an employee and requires the increased exclusion amount to be adjusted for inflation after 2018.