There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

SERVE Act of 2017
Securing Electronic Records for Veterans' Ease Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

SERVE Act of 2017
Securing Electronic Records for Veterans' Ease Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

SERVE Act of 2017
Securing Electronic Records for Veterans' Ease Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to ensure that individuals may access documentation verifying the monthly housing stipend paid to the individual under the Post-9/11 Educational Assistance Program of the Department of Veterans Affairs.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
11/07/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8560)
11/07/2017Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-396.
08/01/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/08/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
11/07/2017-3:59pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/07/2017-3:59pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8560)
11/07/2017-3:51pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3634.
11/07/2017-3:51pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8560-8561)
11/07/2017-3:51pmHouseMr. Bilirakis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/07/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 292.
11/07/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-396.
11/02/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
11/02/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
10/25/2017HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
10/25/2017HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
10/11/2017HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
08/01/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
08/01/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
08/01/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs08/01/2017 Referred to
11/02/2017 Markup by
11/07/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-396
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity08/01/2017 Referred to
10/11/2017 Hearings by
10/25/2017 Markup by
10/25/2017 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs11/08/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3634. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (11/07/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Securing Electronic Records for Veterans' Ease Act of 2017 or the SERVE Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to: (1) furnish individuals receiving Post-9/11 educational assistance with documentation verifying the amount of the recipient's monthly housing stipend, and (2) make such documentation available using an Internet website in the same manner that the VA provides individuals with documentation verifying other compensation and benefits.