There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Military SAVE Act
Military Sexual Assault Victims Empowerment Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Military SAVE Act
Military Sexual Assault Victims Empowerment Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Military SAVE Act
Military Sexual Assault Victims Empowerment Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to carry out a pilot program to improve the access to private health care for veterans who are survivors of military sexual trauma.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/21/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4248-4249)
05/18/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-683.
08/04/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
05/22/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
05/21/2018-3:19pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/21/2018-3:19pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4248-4249)
05/21/2018-3:12pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3642.
05/21/2018-3:12pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4248-4250)
05/21/2018-3:11pmHouseMr. Dunn moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/18/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 526.
05/18/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-683.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/08/2018HouseSubcommittee on Health Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/08/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/08/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
10/24/2017HouseCommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
08/04/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
08/04/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
08/04/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (74)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 10/31/2017
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/31/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/31/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 10/31/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/31/2017
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 10/31/2017
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 10/31/2017
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large] 10/31/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/31/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 10/31/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 10/31/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 10/31/2017
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 10/31/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 10/31/2017
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 10/31/2017
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/31/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 10/31/2017
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 11/01/2017
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/01/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/01/2017
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/01/2017
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 11/02/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 11/02/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 11/06/2017
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 11/06/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/06/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 11/07/2017
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 11/08/2017
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11] 11/08/2017
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/09/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 11/15/2017
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 11/15/2017
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 11/21/2017
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 12/01/2017
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 12/04/2017
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 01/29/2018
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/06/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 02/08/2018
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 02/14/2018
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/14/2018
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 02/15/2018
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/16/2018
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 02/16/2018
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25] 02/16/2018
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/16/2018
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 02/23/2018
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/23/2018
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 02/23/2018
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 02/23/2018
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 02/23/2018
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 02/26/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 02/26/2018
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 02/26/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 02/27/2018
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 02/27/2018
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/27/2018
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/01/2018
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/01/2018
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/05/2018
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 03/05/2018
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 03/07/2018
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 03/07/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/07/2018
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 03/13/2018
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 03/13/2018
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2] 03/13/2018
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 03/14/2018
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 03/19/2018
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/26/2018
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 03/26/2018
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 04/05/2018
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 04/16/2018
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/18/2018
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 04/26/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs08/04/2017 Referred to
10/24/2017 Hearings by
05/08/2018 Markup by
05/18/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-683
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health08/04/2017 Referred to
05/08/2018 Discharged from
Senate Veterans' Affairs05/22/2018 Referred to

As of 12/09/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3642 - Military SAVE Act.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.3642. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (05/21/2018)

Military Sexual Assault Victims Empowerment Act or the Military SAVE Act

(Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to carry out a three-year pilot program of hospital care and medical services for eligible veterans at non-VA health care providers to treat injuries or illnesses resulting from sexual assault, battery, or harassment while the veteran was on active duty, active duty for training, or inactive duty training.

Program participation shall not affect a veteran's ability to receive VA health care.

An eligible veteran may elect to participate in the program and choose his or her provider as long as the provider meets VA requirements.

The program shall be carried out at not more than five sites that meet criteria of city size and rates of sexual assault and rape. At least one site shall be a rural site and not more than 75 veterans may participate at any one site.

The bill sets forth payment provisions for current and new non-VA providers.