There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Special Counsel Independence Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To limit the removal of a special counsel, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
08/15/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/22/2018Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Ms. Jackson Lee. Petition No: 115-9. (Discharge petition text with signatures.)
Action By: House of Representatives
08/15/2017Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/15/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (153)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/28/2017
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 12/07/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/07/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 12/07/2017
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/07/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/07/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/07/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/07/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/07/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 12/07/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 12/07/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 12/07/2017
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 12/07/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/07/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 12/07/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 12/07/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/07/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 12/07/2017
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 12/07/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 12/07/2017
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 12/07/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 01/18/2018
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/18/2018
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/18/2018
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/18/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 01/18/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/18/2018
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/18/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 01/18/2018
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 01/19/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 01/19/2018
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 01/30/2018
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/30/2018
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 01/30/2018
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 01/30/2018
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/30/2018
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 01/30/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 01/30/2018
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/30/2018
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 01/30/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 01/30/2018
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 01/30/2018
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/30/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/30/2018
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 01/30/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/30/2018
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 01/30/2018
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 01/30/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/30/2018
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 01/30/2018
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 01/30/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 01/30/2018
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 01/30/2018
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4] 01/30/2018
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 01/30/2018
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/02/2018
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 02/02/2018
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 02/02/2018
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 02/02/2018
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 02/02/2018
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/02/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 02/02/2018
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 02/02/2018
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 02/02/2018
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 02/02/2018
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 02/02/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/02/2018
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 02/02/2018
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 02/05/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 02/05/2018
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 02/05/2018
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 02/05/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 02/05/2018
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 02/05/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 02/05/2018
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 02/06/2018
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/06/2018
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 02/06/2018
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 02/06/2018
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 02/06/2018
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/06/2018
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 02/06/2018
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/06/2018
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 02/06/2018
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 02/06/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/06/2018
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 02/06/2018
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 02/06/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 02/06/2018
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/06/2018
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/06/2018
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/07/2018
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/07/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 02/07/2018
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 02/07/2018
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 02/13/2018
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 02/13/2018
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 02/13/2018
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/13/2018
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/13/2018
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 02/13/2018
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/13/2018
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 02/14/2018
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/14/2018
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 02/14/2018
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 02/14/2018
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 02/14/2018
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 02/23/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/23/2018
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 02/23/2018
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/23/2018
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 02/23/2018
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/26/2018
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/26/2018
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/27/2018
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/27/2018
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 03/05/2018
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/13/2018
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 03/19/2018
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 03/19/2018
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 03/19/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 03/19/2018
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 03/19/2018
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 03/19/2018
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/19/2018
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/19/2018
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 03/19/2018
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 03/20/2018
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 03/20/2018
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 03/20/2018
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/22/2018
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 03/22/2018
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 03/22/2018
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/22/2018
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/22/2018
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 03/22/2018
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/29/2018
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/05/2018
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 04/05/2018
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/05/2018
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 04/05/2018
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 04/10/2018
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/10/2018
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/10/2018
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 04/10/2018
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 04/11/2018
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/11/2018
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/11/2018
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 04/11/2018
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 04/11/2018
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 04/11/2018
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 04/12/2018
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 04/12/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary08/15/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3654. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (08/15/2017)

Special Counsel Independence Protection Act

This bill sets forth requirements and limitations with respect to the removal from office of a special counsel appointed by the Attorney General, or of another official appointed by the Attorney General who exercises a similar degree of independence from the Department of Justice (DOJ) chain of command.

Specifically, a special counsel or other appointed individual may be removed only if: (1) the Attorney General files an action in the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia and files a contemporaneous notice of the action with Congress; and (2) the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia issues an order finding misconduct, dereliction of duty, incapacity, conflict of interest, or other good cause, including violation of DOJ policies.