There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To amend title 38, United States Code, to authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to provide certain burial benefits for spouses and children of veterans who are buried in tribal cemeteries, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to provide headstones and markers for the graves of spouses and children of veterans who are buried in tribal cemeteries.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/06/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8508)
11/06/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-388.
08/18/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
11/07/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
11/06/2017-5:15pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
11/06/2017-5:15pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/06/2017-5:15pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8508)
11/06/2017-5:08pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3657.
11/06/2017-5:08pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8508-8509)
11/06/2017-5:08pmHouseMr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/06/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 285.
11/06/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-388.
10/12/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote.
10/12/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/13/2017HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs
08/18/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
08/18/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
08/18/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs08/18/2017 Referred to
10/12/2017 Markup by
11/06/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-388
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs08/18/2017 Referred to
09/13/2017 Hearings by
Senate Veterans' Affairs11/07/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3657. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (11/06/2017)

(Sec. 1) This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA), upon request, to provide headstones and markers for the unmarked graves of spouses (including surviving spouses) and children (including unmarried adult children at the VA's discretion) of veterans who are buried in a tribally-owned veterans cemetery or on tribal land owned by or held in trust by a tribal organization.