There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the medical center of the Department of Veterans Affairs in Huntington, West Virginia, as the Hershel "Woody" Williams VA Medical Center.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
06/15/2018Became Public Law No: 115-183. (TXT | PDF)
06/15/2018Signed by President.
06/05/2018Presented to President.
05/24/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
05/24/2018Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2942)
05/21/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4261)
08/22/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
06/15/2018Became Public Law No: 115-183. (TXT | PDF)
06/15/2018Signed by President.
06/05/2018HousePresented to President.
05/25/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/24/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
05/24/2018SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2942)
05/22/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
05/21/2018-4:39pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/21/2018-4:39pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4261)
05/21/2018-4:23pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3663.
05/21/2018-4:23pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4261-4263)
05/21/2018-4:23pmHouseMr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
08/22/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
08/22/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
08/22/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 08/22/2017
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 08/22/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs08/22/2017 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health08/22/2017 Referred to
Senate Veterans' Affairs05/22/2018 Referred to
05/24/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.3663. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-183 (06/15/2018)

(Sec. 1) This bill designates the medical center of the Department of Veterans Affairs in Huntington, West Virginia, as the "Hershel `Woody' Williams VA Medical Center."