There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (34)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

SHARE Act
Sportsmen's Heritage And Recreational Enhancement Act

Short Titles as Reported to House for portions of this bill
  • Federal Land Transaction Facilitation Act Reauthorization
  • Fishing Protection Act
  • GO Act
  • Good Samaritan Search and Recovery Act
  • Grand Canyon Bison Management Act
  • Guides and Outfitters Act
  • Hearing Protection Act
  • Hunter Access Corridors Act
  • Hunter and Farmer Protection Act
  • Lawful Purpose and Self Defense Act
  • North American Wetlands Conservation Extension Act
  • Open Book on Equal Access to Justice Act
  • Polar Bear Conservation and Fairness Act
  • Recreational Fishing and Hunting Heritage and Opportunities Act
  • Recreational Lands Self-Defense Act
  • Target Practice and Marksmanship Training Support Act

Short Titles as Introduced

SHARE Act
Sportsmen's Heritage And Recreational Enhancement Act

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Federal Land Transaction Facilitation Act Reauthorization
  • Fishing Protection Act
  • Good Samaritan Search and Recovery Act
  • Hearing Protection Act
  • Hunter Access Corridors Act
  • Hunter and Farmer Protection Act
  • Lawful Purpose and Self Defense Act
  • North American Wetlands Conservation Extension Act
  • Open Book on Equal Access to Justice Act
  • Polar Bear Conservation and Fairness Act
  • Recreational Fishing and Hunting Heritage and Opportunities Act
  • Recreational Lands Self-Defense Act
  • Target Practice and Marksmanship Training Support Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the preservation of sportsmen's heritage and enhance recreation opportunities on Federal land, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
09/18/2017Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
09/18/2017Committee on Transportation discharged.
09/18/2017Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
09/18/2017Committee on the Judiciary discharged.
09/18/2017Committee on Agriculture discharged.
09/18/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-314, Part I.
09/01/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (22)

Date
09/18/2017Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 224.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/18/2017Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/18/2017Committee on Transportation discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/18/2017Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/18/2017Committee on the Judiciary discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/18/2017Committee on Agriculture discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/18/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-314, Part I.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/13/2017Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 13.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/13/2017Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/12/2017Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands
09/08/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/05/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/05/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/05/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
09/05/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
09/01/2017Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/01/2017Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/01/2017Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/01/2017Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/01/2017Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/01/2017Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/01/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 09/01/2017
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 09/01/2017
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/06/2017
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/07/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/14/2017

Committees (6)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources09/01/2017 Referred to
09/13/2017 Markup by
09/18/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-314
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands09/05/2017 Referred to
09/12/2017 Hearings by
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans09/05/2017 Referred to
House Agriculture09/01/2017 Referred to
09/18/2017 Discharged from
House Judiciary09/01/2017 Referred to
09/18/2017 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce09/01/2017 Referred to
09/18/2017 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy09/08/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure09/01/2017 Referred to
09/18/2017 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management09/05/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment09/05/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means09/01/2017 Referred to
09/18/2017 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.