There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Securing General Aviation and Commercial Charter Air Carrier Service Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Securing General Aviation and Commercial Charter Air Carrier Service Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Securing General Aviation and Commercial Charter Air Carrier Service Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve and streamline security procedures related to general aviation and commercial charter air carrier utilizing risk-based security standards, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/11/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9769)
10/12/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-346.
09/01/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/12/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
12/11/2017-5:05pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/11/2017-5:05pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9769)
12/11/2017-4:53pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3669.
12/11/2017-4:53pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9769-9770)
12/11/2017-4:53pmHouseMr. Estes (KS) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/12/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 250.
10/12/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-346.
09/07/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
09/07/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
09/01/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
09/01/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 09/01/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Homeland Security09/01/2017 Referred to
09/07/2017 Markup by
10/12/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-346
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation12/12/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3669.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.3669. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (12/11/2017)

Securing General Aviation and Commercial Charter Air Carrier Service Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill directs the Transportation Security Administration (TSA) to study the cost and feasibility of establishing web-based access to the Secure Flight passenger screening program for commercial charter air carriers.

(Sec. 3) The TSA is authorized to provide screening services to a commercial charter air carrier in areas other than primary passenger terminals of airports upon such carrier's request. TSA shall enter into an agreement for compensation from such carrier for the cost of providing such services.

(Sec. 4) The TSA shall submit to Congress an implementation plan for the recommendations adopted by the Aviation Security Advisory Committee and concurred to by the TSA:

  • on February 17, 2015, regarding general aviation access to Ronald Reagan Washington National Airport,
  • on July 28, 2016, regarding the vetting of persons seeking flight training in the United States, and
  • prior to enactment of this bill regarding general aviation security.

(Sec. 5) The TSA is authorized to designate at least one full-time TSA employee to be responsible for engagement with general aviation stakeholders and to manage issues related to general aviation.

(Sec. 6) The TSA shall report on the feasibility of requiring security threat assessments for all candidates seeking flight school training in operating aircraft weighing more than 12,500 pounds to enhance the vetting of persons seeking such training in the United States.