There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.367. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/09/2017)

Hearing Protection Act of 2017

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) eliminate the $200 transfer tax on firearm silencers, and (2) treat any person who acquires or possesses a firearm silencer as meeting any registration or licensing requirements of the National Firearms Act with respect to such silencer. Any person who pays a transfer tax on a silencer after October 22, 2015, may receive a refund of such tax.

The bill amends the federal criminal code to preempt state or local laws that tax or regulate firearm silencers.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/09/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
02/06/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: House Judiciary
01/09/2017 Referred to House Judiciary
Action By: House of Representatives
01/09/2017 Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
01/09/2017 Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/09/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Titles (2)

Short Titles:

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced:

Hearing Protection Act of 2017

Official Titles:

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced:

To provide that silencers be treated the same as long guns.


Subjects (6)

  • Federal preemption
  • Firearms and explosives
  • Licensing and registrations
  • Sales and excise taxes
  • State and local taxation

Cosponsors (141)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 01/09/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 01/09/2017
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/09/2017
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 01/09/2017
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 01/09/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 01/12/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 01/12/2017
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 01/12/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 01/12/2017
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 01/12/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 01/12/2017
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 01/12/2017
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 01/12/2017
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 01/12/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 01/12/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3] 01/12/2017
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 01/12/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/12/2017
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 01/12/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 01/12/2017
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 01/12/2017
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 01/12/2017
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 01/12/2017
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 01/13/2017
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 01/13/2017
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 01/13/2017
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/13/2017
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 01/13/2017
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 01/13/2017
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/13/2017
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 01/20/2017
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 01/23/2017
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 01/23/2017
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 01/23/2017
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 01/23/2017
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 01/23/2017
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 01/24/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 01/24/2017
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 01/24/2017
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/24/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 01/27/2017
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5] 01/27/2017
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 01/27/2017
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 01/30/2017
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/03/2017
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 02/06/2017
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 02/06/2017
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/06/2017
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 02/06/2017
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/06/2017
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 02/06/2017
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1] 02/06/2017
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/06/2017
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3] 02/06/2017
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 02/07/2017
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 02/07/2017
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 02/07/2017
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/09/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 02/09/2017
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 02/13/2017
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 02/14/2017
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 02/14/2017
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 02/15/2017
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/16/2017
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/16/2017
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 02/16/2017
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 02/24/2017
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/27/2017
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/27/2017
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 02/28/2017
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/01/2017
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 03/01/2017
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/01/2017
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/01/2017
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 03/01/2017
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 03/02/2017
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 03/02/2017
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 03/02/2017
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 03/06/2017
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/06/2017
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/06/2017
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19] 03/07/2017
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-16] 03/08/2017
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/13/2017
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/16/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 03/16/2017
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/16/2017
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 03/23/2017
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5] 03/23/2017
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/27/2017
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/28/2017
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 03/28/2017
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 04/03/2017
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 04/03/2017
Rep. Hollingsworth, Trey [R-IN-9] 04/03/2017
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/05/2017
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/05/2017
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/12/2017
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/14/2017
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8] 05/02/2017
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4] 05/03/2017
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/08/2017
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/17/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means01/09/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary01/09/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations02/06/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.