There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Criminal Alien Gang Member Removal Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Criminal Alien Gang Member Removal Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act with respect to aliens associated with criminal gangs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/14/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 233 - 175 (Roll no. 517).(text: CR H7387-7389)
09/07/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
09/18/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
09/14/2017-11:00amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/14/2017-11:00amHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 233 - 175 (Roll no. 517). (text: CR H7387-7389)
09/14/2017-10:51amHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 184 - 220 (Roll no. 516).
09/14/2017-10:26amHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
09/14/2017-10:18amHouseFloor summary: DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Beyer motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to add at the end of the bill a section pertaining to Protecting Innocent Religious Workers from Deportation.
09/14/2017-10:18amHouseMr. Beyer moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR H7399)
09/14/2017-10:18amHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
09/14/2017-9:17amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3697.
09/14/2017-9:16amHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 3697 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
09/14/2017-9:16amHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 513. (consideration: CR H7387-7401)
09/13/2017-1:28pmHouseRule H. Res. 513 passed House.
09/12/2017-7:34pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 513 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3697 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
09/07/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/07/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
09/07/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 09/07/2017
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 09/07/2017
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 09/07/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/11/2017
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 09/12/2017
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19] 09/12/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary09/07/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security09/07/2017 Referred to
Senate Judiciary09/18/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3697. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/14/2017)

Criminal Alien Gang Member Removal Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to make an alien: (1) inadmissible if a consular officer, the Department of Homeland Security (DHS), or the Department of Justice (DOJ) knows or has reason to believe that such person is or has been a member of a criminal gang or has participated in criminal gang activities; and (2) deportable if such person is or has been a member of a criminal gang, or has participated in criminal gang activities knowing that such activities will promote illegal activity.

A "criminal gang" is defined as an ongoing group, club, organization, or association of five or more persons: (1) one of the primary purposes of which is the commission of specified criminal offenses and the members of which engage, or have engaged within the past five years, in a continuing series of such offenses; or (2) that has been designated as a criminal gang by DHS. Such offenses include: (1) felony drug offenses, (2) bringing in and harboring certain aliens, (3) assisting certain aliens to enter the United States, (4) importing aliens for immoral purposes, (5) crimes of violence, (6) obstruction of justice or witness tampering, (7) identification document fraud, (8) slavery and trafficking in persons, (9) money laundering, and (10) interstate or foreign travel in connection with a racketeering enterprise.

DHS: (1) may designate a group of five or more persons as a criminal gang based upon its conduct, and (2) shall publish a designation in the Federal Register seven days after providing congressional notification as provided for in this bill. A designation shall be effective until: (1) it is revoked or blocked by Congress; (2) DHS determines that the group no longer fits such designation or that national security or law enforcement interests warrant a revocation; or (3) it is judicially set aside. A group may file a petition for revocation with DHS. The bill prescribes DHS review provisions. A revocation of a designation shall not affect any proceeding based on conduct committed prior to the effective date of the revocation.

Within 30 days after publication of a designation, an amended designation, or a determination in response to a petition for revocation, a designated group may seek judicial review with the U.S. Court of Appeals, DC Circuit.

The bill: (1) provides for mandatory detention of alien gang members; and (2) makes alien gang members ineligible for asylum, temporary protected status, special immigrant juvenile status, and parole (unless such an alien is assisting the United States in a law enforcement matter).