There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Born-Alive Abortion Survivors Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to prohibit a health care practitioner from failing to exercise the proper degree of care in the case of a child who survives an abortion or attempted abortion.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/03/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
01/12/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/03/2017Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (90)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 01/10/2017
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 01/10/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 01/10/2017
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/10/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 01/10/2017
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 01/10/2017
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 01/10/2017
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 01/10/2017
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 01/10/2017
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 01/10/2017
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 01/10/2017
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 01/10/2017
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 01/10/2017
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/10/2017
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/10/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/10/2017
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 01/10/2017
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/10/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/10/2017
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8] 01/10/2017
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 01/10/2017
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/10/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 01/10/2017
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 01/10/2017
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/10/2017
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 01/10/2017
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 01/10/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 01/10/2017
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 01/10/2017
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/10/2017
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 01/10/2017
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/10/2017
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 01/10/2017
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 01/10/2017
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 01/10/2017
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 01/10/2017
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 01/10/2017
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 01/10/2017
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 01/10/2017
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 01/10/2017
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 01/10/2017
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/10/2017
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 01/10/2017
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 01/10/2017
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 01/10/2017
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 01/10/2017
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 01/10/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 01/13/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 01/13/2017
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 01/13/2017
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 01/13/2017
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/13/2017
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 01/13/2017
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 01/13/2017
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 01/13/2017
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 01/13/2017
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/13/2017
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 01/13/2017
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 01/13/2017
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/13/2017
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 01/13/2017
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/13/2017
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 01/13/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 01/24/2017
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 01/24/2017
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 01/24/2017
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/24/2017
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 01/24/2017
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 01/24/2017
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 02/07/2017
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 02/07/2017
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/16/2017
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 03/01/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 03/08/2017
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/08/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/13/2017
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19] 04/03/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/17/2017
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11] 04/17/2017
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 04/25/2017
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 04/26/2017
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 04/28/2017
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 04/28/2017
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 05/01/2017
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/03/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 05/23/2017
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 05/23/2017
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 06/06/2017
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/25/2017
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 10/04/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/03/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice01/12/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.37. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/2017)

Born-Alive Abortion Survivors Protection Act

This bill amends the federal criminal code to require any health care practitioner who is present when a child is born alive following an abortion or attempted abortion to: (1) exercise the same degree of care as reasonably provided to any other child born alive at the same gestational age, and (2) ensure that such child is immediately admitted to a hospital. The term "born alive" means the complete expulsion or extraction from his or her mother, at any stage of development, who after such expulsion or extraction breathes or has a beating heart, pulsation of the umbilical cord, or definite movement of voluntary muscles, regardless of whether the umbilical cord has been cut.

Also, a health care practitioner or other employee who has knowledge of a failure to comply with these requirements must immediately report such failure to an appropriate law enforcement agency.

An individual who violates the provisions of this bill is subject to a criminal fine, up to five years in prison, or both.

An individual who commits an overt act that kills a child born alive is subject to criminal prosecution for murder.

The bill bars the criminal prosecution of a mother of a child born alive for conspiracy to violate these provisions, for being an accessory after the fact, or for concealment of felony.

A woman who undergoes an abortion or attempted abortion may file a civil action for damages against an individual who violates this bill.