There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To repeal the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act and health care-related provisions in the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/09/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date
02/10/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Action By: House Natural Resources
01/26/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: House Ways and Means
01/25/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce
01/09/2017 Referred to House Budget
Action By: House of Representatives
01/09/2017 Referred to House Appropriations
Action By: House of Representatives
01/09/2017 Referred to House Administration
Action By: House of Representatives
01/09/2017 Referred to House Rules
Action By: House of Representatives
01/09/2017 Referred to House Natural Resources
Action By: House of Representatives
01/09/2017 Referred to House Judiciary
Action By: House of Representatives
01/09/2017 Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
01/09/2017 Referred to House Education and the Workforce
Action By: House of Representatives
01/09/2017 Referred to House Energy and Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
01/09/2017 Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, Ways and Means, the Judiciary, Natural Resources, Rules, House Administration, Appropriations, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/09/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/13/2017
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 07/24/2017
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/24/2017
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 07/28/2017

Committees (9)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/09/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health01/25/2017 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce01/09/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means01/09/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health01/26/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary01/09/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources01/09/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs02/10/2017 Referred to
House Rules01/09/2017 Referred to
House Administration01/09/2017 Referred to
House Appropriations01/09/2017 Referred to
House Budget01/09/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (3)

  • Health care costs and insurance
  • Health care coverage and access

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.370. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/09/2017)

This bill repeals the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act and the health care provisions of the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010. The repeal is effective on January 1, 2020. Provisions of law amended by the repealed provisions are restored.

The budgetary effects of this bill must not be entered on the PAYGO scorecards maintained by the Office of Management and Budget.