There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans Fair Debt Notice Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Veterans Fair Debt Notice Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Fair Debt Notice Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to require the use of certified mail and plain language in certain debt collection activities.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
11/08/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 422 - 0 (Roll no. 621).(text: 11/7/2017 CR H8561)
11/07/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-397.
09/07/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/09/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
11/08/2017-5:10pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/08/2017-5:10pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 422 - 0 (Roll no. 621). (text: 11/7/2017 CR H8561)
11/08/2017-5:03pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8643)
11/07/2017-4:08pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
11/07/2017-3:59pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3705.
11/07/2017-3:59pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8561-8562)
11/07/2017-3:59pmHouseMr. Bilirakis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/07/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 293.
11/07/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-397.
11/02/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
11/02/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
09/07/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
09/07/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
09/07/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/01/2017
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 11/06/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs09/07/2017 Referred to
11/02/2017 Markup by
11/07/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-397
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs09/07/2017 Referred to
Senate Veterans' Affairs11/09/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.3705. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (11/08/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on November 7, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Veterans Fair Debt Notice Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to collaborate with veterans service organizations to write a standard letter to be provided to individuals who owe debts to the VA. Such letter shall be written in plain language and shall include a notice of the debt and a clear explanation of: (1) why the individual owes such money, and (2) available options.

The VA shall develop a method by which individuals may elect to receive debt notification letters by electronic means and shall ensure that the letter is delivered: (1) by both standard mail and electronic means to individuals who have made such election, and (2) only by standard mail to individuals who have not made such election.

The VA shall: (1) notify Congress regarding the completion of such letter, and (2) study and report to Congress on the process by which it notifies veterans of debt collection efforts.