There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Major General Tim Lowenberg National Guard Cyber Defenders Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 10, United States Code, to provide for the establishment and operation of reserve component cyber civil support teams, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/08/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
10/17/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
09/08/2017Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/08/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 09/08/2017
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 09/08/2017
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 09/28/2017
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/28/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/28/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/28/2017
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 09/28/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/28/2017
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/05/2017
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/05/2017
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/05/2017
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/05/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/05/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 10/05/2017
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 10/05/2017
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 10/05/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/05/2017
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 10/05/2017
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 10/05/2017
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/23/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 10/24/2017
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4] 10/26/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 10/26/2017
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 10/26/2017
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 11/01/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 11/02/2017
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 11/02/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 11/03/2017
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 11/28/2017
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 12/01/2017
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 12/04/2017
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 12/06/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/14/2018
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 02/26/2018
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/05/2018
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/05/2018
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 04/23/2018
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/17/2018
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/01/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Armed Services09/08/2017 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel10/17/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3712. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/08/2017)

Major General Tim Lowenberg National Guard Cyber Defenders Act

This bill allows certain military reserve components, including a reserve assigned or attached to a reserve component cyber civil support team, to perform duties to prepare for or respond to any emergency involving an attack or natural disaster impacting a computer, electronic, or cyber network. By September 30, 2022, each state, the District of Columbia, Puerto Rico, Guam, and the Virgin Islands shall have an operational reserve component cyber civil support team composed of reserve component members of the Armed Forces.