There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

EMPOWER Act of 2018
Educating Medical Professionals and Optimizing Workforce Efficiency and Readiness Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

EMPOWER Act of 2017
Educating Medical Professionals and Optimizing Workforce Efficiency and Readiness Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title VII of the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize certain programs relating to the health professions workforce, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
07/23/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
09/11/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
07/24/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
07/23/2018-2:50pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/23/2018-2:50pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6598-6599)
07/23/2018-2:44pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3728.
07/23/2018-2:44pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6598-6600)
07/23/2018-2:44pmHouseMr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/12/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/12/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/27/2018HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
06/27/2018HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
09/15/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/11/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
09/11/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/11/2017
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 09/11/2017
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/18/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce09/11/2017 Referred to
07/12/2018 Markup by
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health09/15/2017 Referred to
06/27/2018 Markup by
06/27/2018 Reported by
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions07/24/2018 Referred to

As of 09/26/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3728 - EMPOWER Act of 2018.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.