There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Comprehensive Operations, Sustainability, and Transport Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Comprehensive Operations, Sustainability, and Transport Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend titles XI and XVIII of the Social Security Act to facilitate provider and supplier cost reporting of ambulance services under the Medicare program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/21/2017Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
12/21/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-481, Part I.
09/11/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date All Actions
12/21/2017Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 356.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/21/2017Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/21/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-481, Part I.
09/15/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/13/2017Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
09/13/2017Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
09/11/2017Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/11/2017Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/11/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 09/11/2017
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 09/14/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/25/2017
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/06/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means09/11/2017 Referred to
09/13/2017 Markup by
12/21/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-481
House Energy and Commerce09/11/2017 Referred to
12/21/2017 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health09/15/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3729. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/11/2017)

Comprehensive Operations, Sustainability, and Transport Act of 2017

This bill modifies Medicare payment rules and reporting requirements with respect to ground-ambulance services.