There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Secret Service Recruitment and Retention Act of 2018

Other Short Titles

Secret Service Recruitment and Retention Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Secret Service Recruitment and Retention Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Secret Service Recruitment and Retention Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Secret Service Recruitment and Retention Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Secret Service Recruitment and Retention Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide overtime pay for employees of the United States Secret Service, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
04/03/2018Became Public Law No: 115-160. (TXT | PDF)
04/03/2018Signed by President.
03/22/2018Presented to President.
03/21/2018Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.(text: CR H1751)
03/19/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S1796)
03/19/2018Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
12/05/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 4 (Roll no. 655).(text: CR H9633)
12/04/2017Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-435, Part I.
09/11/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (27)

Date Chamber
04/03/2018Became Public Law No: 115-160. (TXT | PDF)
04/03/2018Signed by President.
03/22/2018HousePresented to President.
03/21/2018-10:09pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/21/2018-10:08pmHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H1751)
03/21/2018-10:08pmHouseMr. Gowdy asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's Table and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H1751)
03/20/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/19/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S1796)
03/19/2018SenateS.Amdt.2214 Amendment SA 2214 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
03/19/2018SenateS.Amdt.2214 Amendment SA 2214 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Grassley. In the nature of a substitute.
03/19/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1796)
03/19/2018SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
12/06/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
12/05/2017-1:38pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/05/2017-1:38pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 4 (Roll no. 655). (text: CR H9633)
12/05/2017-1:12pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9639-9640)
12/05/2017-12:55pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/05/2017-12:29pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3731.
12/05/2017-12:29pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9633-9637)
12/05/2017-12:29pmHouseMr. Rutherford moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
12/04/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-435, Part I.
09/27/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/13/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
09/13/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/11/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/11/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/11/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary09/11/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations09/27/2017 Referred to
House Oversight and Government Reform09/11/2017 Referred to
09/13/2017 Markup by
12/04/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-435
Senate Judiciary12/06/2017 Referred to
03/19/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (6)

There are 6 summaries for H.R.3731. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-160 (04/03/2018)

Secret Service Recruitment and Retention Act of 2018

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Overtime Pay for Protective Services Act of 2016 to extend through 2018, subject to specified limitations, the exemption of U.S. Secret Service officers, employees, and agents who perform protective services from the limitation on premium pay otherwise applicable to federal employees. The bill specifies that the exemption also applies to the U.S. Secret Service Uniformed Division.

The bill provides that such amendments shall take effect as if they had been enacted on December 31, 2016.

The Secret Service must report to Congress by January 30, 2018, and January 30, 2019, on premium pay above the limitation paid to Secret Service personnel in the previous year.

(Sec. 3) The Government Accountability Office shall study and report to specified congressional committees on the extent of the progress made by the Secret Service in implementing the recommendations of the U.S. Secret Service Protective Mission Panel, including those items which pertain to training and personnel enumerated in the Executive Summary to Report from the panel to the Secretary of Homeland Security, dated December 15, 2014.