Text: H.R.3731 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-160 (04/03/2018)

 
[115th Congress Public Law 160]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]



[[Page 1245]]

                       SECRET SERVICE RECRUITMENT 
                        AND RETENTION ACT OF 2018

[[Page 132 STAT. 1246]]

Public Law 115-160
115th Congress

                                 An Act


 
   To provide overtime pay for employees of the United States Secret 
 Service, and for other purposes. <<NOTE: Apr. 3, 2018 -  [H.R. 3731]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled, <<NOTE: Secret Service 
Recruitment and Retention Act of 2018. 5 USC 101 note.>> 
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Secret Service Recruitment and 
Retention Act of 2018''.
SEC. 2. EXTENSION OF OVERTIME PAY EXCEPTION THROUGH 2018 FOR 
                    PROTECTIVE SERVICES.

    (a) Amendments.--
            (1) In general.--Section 2 of the Overtime Pay for 
        Protective Services Act of 2016 (5 U.S.C. 5547 note) is 
        amended--
                    (A) in the section heading, by striking ``in 2016'' 
                and inserting ``during 2016 through 2018'';
                    (B) in subsection (a), by striking ``2016'' and 
                inserting ``2016, 2017, or 2018''; and
                    (C) in subsection (b), by striking paragraph (1) and 
                inserting the following:
            ``(1) In general.--Notwithstanding any other provision of 
        law, including section 5547(a) of title 5, United States Code, 
        and only to the extent that an appropriation is provided 
        specifically in an appropriations Act for premium pay in excess 
        of the annual equivalent of the limitation on the rate of pay 
        contained in section 5547(a), any covered employee may receive 
        premium pay during 2016, 2017, and 2018, to the extent provided 
        under section 118 of the Treasury and General Government 
        Appropriations Act, 2001 (5 U.S.C. 5547 note).''.
            (2) Clarifying provision.--Section 118 of the Treasury and 
        General Government Appropriations Act, 2001 (5 U.S.C. 5547 note) 
        is amended, in the first sentence, by inserting ``or 3056A'' 
        after ``section 3056(a)''.

    (b) <<NOTE: 5 USC 5547 note.>>  Effective Date.--The amendments made 
by subsection (a) shall take effect as if enacted on December 31, 2016.

    (c) Report on Extensions.--Not later than January 30, 2018, and 
January 30, 2019, the Director of the Secret Service shall submit to the 
Committee on Homeland Security and the Committee on Oversight and 
Government Reform of the House of Representatives and the Committee on 
Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs of the Senate a report on the 
effects of the amendment made by subsection (a)(2). The report shall 
include, with respect to the previous calendar year--

[[Page 132 STAT. 1247]]

            (1) the total number of United States Secret Service 
        personnel receiving premium pay above the premium pay limitation 
        in subsection (a) of section 5547 of title 5, United States 
        Code;
            (2) the total amount of premium pay for that calendar year 
        paid to United States Secret Service personnel above the premium 
        pay limitation in such subsection;
            (3) the mean and median amount of premium pay paid to United 
        States Secret Service personnel above the premium pay limitation 
        in such subsection;
            (4) the greatest amount paid to United States Secret Service 
        personnel above the premium pay limitation in such subsection 
        and the number of employees who received that amount;
            (5) notwithstanding the amendments made by subsection (a), 
        the total number of United States Secret Service personnel who 
        were not fully compensated for service because of the premium 
        pay earnings limitation in section 118 of the Treasury and 
        General Government Appropriations Act, 2001 (5 U.S.C. 5547 
        note);
            (6) the total amount of premium pay United States Secret 
        Service personnel would have been paid but for the premium pay 
        earnings limitation in such section; and
            (7) <<NOTE: Lists.>>  a list of United States Secret Service 
        personnel who, within the calendar year, received premium pay 
        above the premium pay limitation in subsection (a) of section 
        5547 of title 5, United States Code, and separated from the 
        agency, including the type of separation in each case.
SEC. 3. REPORT OF THE COMPTROLLER GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES.

    Not later than 1 year after the effective date of this section, the 
Comptroller General of the United States shall complete a study and 
submit to the Committee on the Judiciary of the House of 
Representatives, the Committee on the Judiciary of the Senate, the 
Committee on Oversight and Government Reform of the House of 
Representatives, and the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental 
Affairs of the Senate a report on the extent of the progress made by the 
United States Secret Service in implementing the recommendations of the 
United States Secret Service Protective Mission Panel, including in 
particular those items pertaining to training and personnel enumerated 
in the Executive Summary to Report from the United States Secret Service 
Protective Mission

[[Page 132 STAT. 1248]]

Panel to the Secretary of Homeland Security dated December 15, 2014.

    Approved April 3, 2018.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 3731:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

HOUSE REPORTS: No. 115-435, Pt. 1 (Comm. on Oversight and Government 
Reform).
CONGRESSIONAL RECORD:
                                                        Vol. 163 (2017):
                                    Dec. 5, considered and passed House.
                                                        Vol. 164 (2018):
                                    Mar. 19, considered and passed 
                                        Senate, amended.
                                    Mar. 21, House concurred in Senate 
                                        amendment.

                                  <all>