There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Social Media Use in Clearance Investigations Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Social Media Use in Clearance Investigations Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Social Media Use in Clearance Investigations Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for a study on the use of social media in security clearance investigations.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
03/06/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
01/11/2018Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-512.
09/12/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
03/07/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
03/06/2018-3:40pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/06/2018-3:40pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1416)
03/06/2018-3:33pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3737.
03/06/2018-3:33pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1416-1417)
03/06/2018-3:33pmHouseMr. Blum moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
01/11/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 382.
01/11/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-512.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
09/13/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
09/13/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
09/12/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
09/12/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 09/12/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform09/12/2017 Referred to
09/13/2017 Markup by
01/11/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-512
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs03/07/2018 Referred to

As of 04/21/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3737 - Social Media Use in Clearance Investigations Act of 2017.


Subjects (6)

  • Congressional oversight
  • Employee hiring
  • Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
  • Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
  • Internet and video services

Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.3737. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (03/06/2018)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

Social Media Use in Clearance Investigations Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill directs the Office of Management and Budget to report on the examination of social media activity during security clearance investigations.