There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Presidential Allowance Modernization Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Presidential Allowance Modernization Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Presidential Allowance Modernization Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Act of August 25, 1958, commonly known as the "Former Presidents Act of 1958", with respect to the monetary allowance payable to a former President, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
11/13/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9145-9146)
11/13/2017Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-407.
09/12/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/14/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
11/13/2017-4:51pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/13/2017-4:51pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9145-9146)
11/13/2017-4:38pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3739.
11/13/2017-4:38pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9145-9148)
11/13/2017-4:38pmHouseMr. Hice, Jody B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/13/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 301.
11/13/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-407.
09/13/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
09/13/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
09/12/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
09/12/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 09/14/2017
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/14/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 10/03/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Government Reform09/12/2017 Referred to
09/13/2017 Markup by
11/13/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-407
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs11/14/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3739. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (11/13/2017)

Presidential Allowance Modernization Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Former Presidents Act of 1958 to to revise provisions governing the compensation provided to a former President. Each former President shall receive from the United States an annuity of $200,000 per year. The General Services Administration (GSA) is authorized to provide each former President a monetary allowance of $500,000 per year for five years beginning six months after the expiration of his or her term, $350,000 per year for the next five years, and $250,000 per year thereafter.

Such annuity and allowance shall be increased each year by the same percentage as Social Security benefits.

Such allowance shall be reduced by the amount the former President's earned income exceeds $400,000.

The bill: (1) limits the office staff provided for each former President to not more than 13 individuals, and (2) requires that suitable office space for a former President be provided on a reimbursable basis.

The increases from $20,000 per year to $100,000 per year, and provides for cost-of-living adjustments to, the monetary allowance amount for surviving spouses of former Presidents.