There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Business of Insurance Regulatory Reform Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Business of Insurance Regulatory Reform Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Consumer Financial Protection Act of 2010 to clarify the authority of the Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection with respect to persons regulated by a State insurance regulator, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
05/10/2018Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-668.
09/12/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
05/10/2018Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 513.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/10/2018Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-668.
01/18/2018Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 37 - 18.
01/18/2018Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
01/17/2018Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/12/2017Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/12/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 09/12/2017
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 10/27/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 11/30/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 01/17/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services09/12/2017 Referred to
01/18/2018 Markup by
05/10/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-668

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3746. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (05/10/2018)

Business of Insurance Regulatory Reform Act of 2017

This bill amends the Consumer Financial Protection Act of 2010 to revise the authority of the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (CFPB) over activities regulated by a state insurance regulator. The CFPB may not enforce the Act against any person regulated by a state insurance regulator and offering a consumer financial product or service, to the extent that person is engaged in the business of insurance. If a person engaged in the business of insurance is regulated by a state insurance regulator but otherwise subject to the Act, the CFPB must construe its authority narrowly.