There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the Federal building and United States courthouse located at 719 Church Street in Nashville, Tennessee, as the "Fred D. Thompson Federal Building and United States Courthouse".


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
06/06/2017Became Public Law No: 115-39. (TXT | PDF)
06/06/2017Signed by President.
05/25/2017Presented to President.
05/24/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3111)
03/07/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1547)
03/07/2017Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-23.
01/09/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/06/2017Became Public Law No: 115-39. (TXT | PDF)
06/06/2017Signed by President.
05/25/2017HousePresented to President.
05/24/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/24/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3111)
03/08/2017SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
03/07/2017-7:30pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/07/2017-7:30pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1547)
03/07/2017-7:30pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1574)
03/07/2017-5:41pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Johnson (GA) objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
03/07/2017-5:14pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 375.
03/07/2017-5:14pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1547-1550)
03/07/2017-5:14pmHouseMr. Barletta moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/07/2017HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 15.
03/07/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-23.
02/28/2017HouseSubcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged.
02/28/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/28/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
01/10/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
01/09/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
01/09/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (8)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Transportation and Infrastructure01/09/2017 Referred to
02/28/2017 Markup by
03/07/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-23
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management01/10/2017 Referred to
02/28/2017 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.375. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-39 (06/06/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House passed version is repeated here.)

(Sec. 1) This bill designates the federal building and U.S. courthouse located at 719 Church Street in Nashville, Tennessee, as the "Fred D. Thompson Federal Building and United States Courthouse."