There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

GAIN Act
Grow American Incomes Now Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to modify the earned income tax credit to account for the amount by which economic growth has outpaced income growth, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/13/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
09/13/2017Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/13/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/13/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 09/13/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 09/14/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 09/28/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/10/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 10/10/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/26/2017
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 12/06/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means09/13/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3757. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/13/2017)

Grow American Incomes Now Act of 2017 or the GAIN Act

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code, with respect to the earned income tax credit (EITC), to: (1) increase specified credit and phaseout percentages, (2) increase the earned income amounts and the phaseout amounts, (3) decrease from 25 to 21 the minimum eligibility age for individuals without qualifying children, and (4) allow employees to elect to receive advance payments of the EITC from employers when wages are paid.