There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Cyber Diplomacy Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Cyber Diplomacy Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Cyber Diplomacy Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To support United States international cyber diplomacy, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
06/28/2018Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
01/17/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H435-437)
01/03/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 115-483.
09/14/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
06/28/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 495.
06/28/2018SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
06/26/2018SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
01/18/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
01/17/2018-2:36pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/17/2018-2:36pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H435-437)
01/17/2018-2:20pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3776.
01/17/2018-2:20pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H435-439)
01/17/2018-2:20pmHouseMr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
01/03/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 357.
01/03/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 115-483.
11/15/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
11/15/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/14/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
09/14/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs09/14/2017 Referred to
11/15/2017 Markup by
01/03/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-483
Senate Foreign Relations01/18/2018 Referred to
06/26/2018 Markup by
06/28/2018 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.3776.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3776. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/14/2017)

Cyber Diplomacy Act of 2017

This bill sets forth U.S. international cyberspace policy, in furtherance specifically of the promotion of an open, interoperable, reliable, unfettered, and secure Internet governed by a model that promotes human rights, democracy, and the rule of law, while respecting privacy and guarding against deception, fraud, and theft. The bill includes the establishment of an Office of Cyber Issues in the Department of State.

The President is encouraged to enter into executive arrangements with foreign governments that support the cyberspace policy.