There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Bonuses for Cost-Cutters Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Bonuses for Cost-Cutters Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Bonuses for Cost-Cutters Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 5, United States Code, to enhance the authority under which Federal agencies may pay cash awards to employees for making cost saving disclosures, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
10/11/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7948-7949)
10/10/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-341.
01/09/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/16/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
10/11/2017-3:24pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/11/2017-3:24pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7948-7949)
10/11/2017-3:14pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 378.
10/11/2017-3:14pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7948-7950)
10/11/2017-3:13pmHouseMr. Russell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/10/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 246.
10/10/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-341.
07/19/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
07/19/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
01/09/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
01/09/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 01/09/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Government Reform01/09/2017 Referred to
07/19/2017 Markup by
10/10/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-341
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs10/16/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.378. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/11/2017)


Bonuses for Cost-Cutters Act of 2017

This bill expands the awards program for cost-saving identifications by federal employees of fraud, waste, or mismanagement to include identifications of certain operational expenses that are wasteful. An agency must propose any such identified wasteful expenses for rescission.

The bill also doubles the maximum cash award that may be made under the program.