There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Small Entity Regulatory Relief Opportunity Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Communications Act of 1934 to provide for streamlined procedures for waiver petitions seeking relief for small entities from regulations issued by the Federal Communications Commission, to require the Commission to defer the application of new regulations to small entities, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/14/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
09/15/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/14/2017Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/14/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 09/14/2017
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 11/13/2017
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 11/30/2017
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/06/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce09/14/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology09/15/2017 Referred to

As of 09/19/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3787 - Small Entity Regulatory Relief Opportunity Act of 2017.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.