There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Tijuana River Valley Comprehensive Protection and Rehabilitation Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of the Army, acting through the Chief of Engineers, to carry out a comprehensive protection and rehabilitation program for the Tijuana River Valley, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/14/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
11/29/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on the Western Hemisphere.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
09/15/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
09/15/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
09/14/2017Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/14/2017Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/14/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 09/14/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/26/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 01/16/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure09/14/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management09/15/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment09/15/2017 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs09/14/2017 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Western Hemisphere11/29/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3795.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3795. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/14/2017)

Tijuana River Valley Comprehensive Protection and Rehabilitation Act of 2017

This bill directs the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers to carry out a comprehensive protection and rehabilitation program to enhance the physical infrastructure in both the United States and Mexico to prevent flooding and wastewater, sewage, trash, and sediment spills in the Tijuana River Valley, including carrying out coordinated restoration and protection activities that enhance the infrastructure. Grants and technical assistance must be provided under the program to state and local governments, nonprofit organizations, and institutions of higher education, in both countries.

In addition, the Corps of Engineers must develop a feasibility and technical assistance plan for updated wastewater infrastructure and flood preparedness in the river valley.

Using the systems of the International Boundary and Water Commission, United States and Mexico, the Department of State must establish the Transboundary Waterway Alert System, an updated and online system to protect U.S. citizens from undue and avoidable harm from wastewater, sewage, trash, and sediment spills and flooding for each major waterway along the U.S.-Mexico border.

The State Department must notify Mexico, the cities of San Diego and Imperial Beach, and the county of San Diego upon the initial discovery of such spills.