There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Department of Veterans Affairs Expiring Authorities Act of 2017

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Department of Veterans Affairs Expiring Authorities Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Department of Veterans Affairs Expiring Authorities Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to extend certain expiring provisions of law administered by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
09/29/2017Became Public Law No: 115-62. (TXT | PDF)
09/29/2017Signed by President.
09/28/2017Presented to President.
09/27/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6191)
09/25/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7469-7471)
09/25/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/29/2017Became Public Law No: 115-62. (TXT | PDF)
09/29/2017Signed by President.
09/28/2017HousePresented to President.
09/27/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/27/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6191)
09/26/2017SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
09/25/2017-5:54pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/25/2017-5:54pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7469-7471)
09/25/2017-5:40pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3819.
09/25/2017-5:40pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7469-7472)
09/25/2017-5:40pmHouseMr. Bilirakis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/25/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/25/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/25/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/25/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 09/25/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 09/25/2017

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs09/25/2017 Referred to
House Budget09/25/2017 Referred to
House Armed Services09/25/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3819.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3819. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-62 (09/29/2017)

Department of Veterans Affairs Expiring Authorities Act of 2017

This bill reauthorizes specific Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) programs and services, including those related to health care, benefits, and homeless veteran reintegration.

TITLE I--EXTENSIONS OF AUTHORITY RELATING TO HEALTH CARE

(Sec. 101) This title extends through FY2019 VA authority to: (1) collect copayments for veterans' hospital and nursing home care, (2) provide nursing home care to veterans with service-connected disabilities, (3) collect the cost of treating non-service-connected disabilities from third parties, and (4) provide and fund child care for certain veterans receiving health care.

(Sec. 103) This section reauthorizes through FY2019 funding for assistance and support services for caregivers.

(Sec. 106) This section extends through FY2019 grants to veterans service organizations to transport highly rural veterans.

(Sec. 107) This section extends through January 6, 2018, the pilot program providing community-based assisted living services for veterans with traumatic brain injury. The final program report must be submitted by December 6, 2017.

(Sec. 108) This section extends through FY2019 the pilot program providing counseling in retreat settings for women veterans recently separated from service. The final program report must be submitted by March 31, 2018.

(Sec. 109) This section extends the authority to temporarily extend payments and allowances for beneficiary travel in connection with veterans receiving care from VA centers. The reporting date for such program is extended to March 31, 2018.

TITLE II--EXTENSIONS OF AUTHORITY RELATING TO BENEFITS

(Sec. 201) This title extends authority of the VA to (1) calculate the net value of real property at the time of foreclosure during default procedures, (2) manage property and vendee loans after default, and (3) provide rehabilitation and vocational benefits to service members with severe injuries or illnesses.

TITLE III--EXTENSIONS OF AUTHORITY RELATING TO HOMELESS VETERANS

(Sec. 301) This title reauthorizes

  • homeless veteran reintegration programs, including programs for homeless women veterans and homeless veterans with children;
  • referral and counseling services for veterans at risk of homelessness transitioning from certain institutions;
  • the provision of financial assistance for supportive services for very low-income veteran families in permanent housing;
  • the grant program that benefits homeless veterans with special needs, including those who are terminally ill and chronically mentally ill;
  • the Advisory Committee on Homeless Veterans; and
  • the provision of care and services for veterans suffering from serious mental illness and homelessness.

TITLE IV--OTHER EXTENSIONS AND MODIFICATIONS OF AUTHORITY AND OTHER MATTERS

(Sec. 401) This title extends VA authority to

  • transport individuals to and from VA facilities in connection with vocational rehabilitation, counseling, examination, treatment, or care;
  • operate the VA regional office in the Philippines; and
  • provide monthly assistance allowances under the Office of National Veterans Sports Programs and Special Events.

(Sec. 404) This section extends the requirement for VA reports to Congress regarding equitable relief for errors in providing benefits administered by the VA.

(Sec. 405) This section extends the authorization of appropriations for the adaptive sports program for disabled veterans and service members.

(Sec. 406) The title extends VA authorities for

  • the Advisory Committee on Minority Veterans,
  • the program to assist certain veterans with disabilities in acquiring suitable housing,
  • grants to encourage the development of new assistive technologies for specially adapted housing,
  • guarantees of payments of principal and interest on loans in connection with the sale of certain properties,
  • review and evaluation by the National Academy of Sciences of the evidence of association between diseases and exposure to dioxin and herbicides, and
  • payment of a reporting fee to educational institutions.

TITLE V--TECHNICAL CORRECTIONS

(Sec. 501) The bill makes technical amendments to the Harry W. Colmery Veterans Educational Assistance Act of 2017, also known as the Forever GI Bill.