There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

PASS Act of 2017
Protecting Advice for Small Savers Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

PASS Act of 2017
Protecting Advice for Small Savers Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 to establish standards of conduct for brokers and dealers that are in the best interest of their retail customers.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
12/28/2018Committee on Education and the Workforce discharged.
12/28/2018Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
08/10/2018Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-894, Part I.
09/27/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date All Actions
12/28/2018Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 865.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/28/2018Committee on Education and the Workforce discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/28/2018Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/16/2018House Committee on Education and the Workforce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 28, 2018.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/16/2018House Committee on Ways and Means Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 28, 2018.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/10/2018House Committee on Education and the Workforce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Nov. 16, 2018.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/10/2018House Committee on Ways and Means Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Nov. 16, 2018.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/10/2018Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-894, Part I.
10/12/2017Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 34 - 26.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
10/12/2017Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
10/11/2017Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
09/27/2017Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/27/2017Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/27/2017Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/27/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives
07/13/2017Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Capital Markets Prior to Introduction and Referral.
Action By: House Financial Services Subcommittee on Capital Markets

Cosponsors (15)


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services09/27/2017 Referred to
10/12/2017 Markup by
08/10/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-894
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Capital Markets07/13/2017 Hearings by
House Ways and Means09/27/2017 Referred to
12/28/2018 Discharged from
House Education and the Workforce09/27/2017 Referred to
12/28/2018 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.3857.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3857. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/27/2017)

Protecting Advice for Small Savers Act of 2017 or the PASS Act of 2017

This bill nullifies the Department of Labor's "fiduciary duty" rule (which requires a retirement advisor to act in the best interest of the investor) and otherwise revises standards of conduct for brokers and dealers.