There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Taxpayers DIME Act of 2017
Taxpayers Don't Incur Meaningless Expenses Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To limit the use of Federal funds for the use of the travel expenses of senior Federal officials in contravention of certain regulations, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/28/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
09/28/2017 Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/28/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 09/28/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 10/02/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 10/02/2017
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 10/02/2017
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 10/11/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 12/12/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform09/28/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

As of 01/19/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.3879 - Taxpayers DIME Act of 2017.

Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3879. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/28/2017)

Taxpayers Don't Incur Meaningless Expenses Act of 2017 or the Taxpayers DIME Act of 2017

This bill prohibits the use of federal funds for travel expenses of senior federal officials in violation of specified federal travel regulations.

Federal agencies must submit quarterly reports to Congress on travel by senior federal officials on government aircraft.

The Office of Government Ethics must submit to Congress and publish a report on suggestions to strengthen federal travel regulations.