There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

TALENT Act of 2017
Tested Ability to Leverage Exceptional National Talent Act of 2017

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

TALENT Act of 2017
Tested Ability to Leverage Exceptional National Talent Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

TALENT Act of 2017
Tested Ability to Leverage Exceptional National Talent Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 5, United States Code, to codify the Presidential Innovation Fellows Program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
01/20/2017 Became Public Law No: 115-1. (TXT | PDF)
01/20/2017 Signed by President.
01/20/2017 Presented to President.
01/17/2017 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S345-346)
01/11/2017 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 386 - 17 (Roll no. 34).(text: CR 1/10/2017 H283)
01/03/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
01/20/2017 Became Public Law No: 115-1. (TXT | PDF)
01/20/2017 Signed by President.
01/20/2017 House Presented to President.
01/18/2017 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
01/17/2017 Senate Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S345-346)
01/12/2017 Senate Received in the Senate, read twice.
01/11/2017-1:47pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/11/2017-1:47pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 386 - 17 (Roll no. 34). (text: CR 1/10/2017 H283)
01/11/2017-1:40pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H322-323)
01/10/2017-6:16pm House At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
01/10/2017-6:01pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 39.
01/10/2017-6:01pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H283-285)
01/10/2017-6:01pm House Mr. Hurd moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
01/03/2017 House Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
01/03/2017 House Introduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform01/03/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (8)

  • Advanced technology and technological innovations
  • Advisory bodies
  • Executive agency funding and structure
  • General Services Administration
  • Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
  • Product development and innovation
  • Public-private cooperation

Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.39. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-1 (01/20/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House passed version is repeated here.)

Tested Ability to Leverage Exceptional National Talent Act of 2017 or the TALENT Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill codifies provisions establishing the Presidential Innovation Fellows Program (originally established pursuant to Executive Order 13704) to encourage successful entrepreneurs, executives, and innovators to join the government and work in close cooperation with government leaders to create meaningful solutions that can help save lives and taxpayer money, fuel job creation, and significantly improve how the government serves the American people.

The General Services Administration (GSA) shall continue the program in order to enable exceptional individuals with proven track records to serve time-limited appointments in executive agencies to address some of the nation's most significant challenges and improve existing government efforts that would particularly benefit from expertise using innovative techniques and technology.

The program shall be administered by a Director, who shall appoint program fellows and facilitate their placement to participate in projects that have the potential for significant positive effects and that are consistent with the President's goals.

The GSA shall continue an advisory board to recommend priorities and standards for fulfilling the program's mission and to assist in identifying potential projects and placements for fellows.