There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Minnesota's Economic Rights in the Superior National Forest Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Minnesota's Economic Rights in the Superior National Forest Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Minnesota's Economic Rights in the Superior National Forest Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require congressional approval of any mineral withdrawal or monument designation involving the National Forest System lands in the State of Minnesota, to provide for the renewal of certain mineral leases in such lands, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
11/30/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 216 - 204 (Roll no. 643).
11/21/2017Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-422.
10/02/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (26)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/01/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
11/30/2017-1:51pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/30/2017-1:51pmHouseOn passage Passed by recorded vote: 216 - 204 (Roll no. 643).
11/30/2017-1:43pmHouseH.Amdt.487 On agreeing to the Grijalva amendment (A002) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 182 - 237 (Roll no. 642). (consideration: CR H9535)
11/30/2017-1:17pmHouseUNFINISHED BUSINESS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule 19, the House resumed with further consideration of H.R. 3905. (consideration: CR H9535-9536)
11/29/2017-4:39pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule 19, further consideration of H.R. 3905 is postponed.
11/29/2017-4:38pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
11/29/2017-4:28pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 631, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Grijalva amendment No. 1.
11/29/2017-4:28pmHouseH.Amdt.487 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Grijalva. (consideration: CR H9510; text: CR H9510)
11/29/2017-4:16pmHouseDEBATE - The House resumed with debate on H.R. 3905.
11/29/2017-3:22pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3905.
11/29/2017-3:21pmHouseThe rules provides 1 hour of general debate on both bills. For H.R. 3017, the bill is closed to amendments. For H.R. 3905, the rule provides for a specified amendment. The rule also provides for one motion to recommit with or without instructions on each bill.
11/29/2017-3:21pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 631. (consideration: CR H9498-9512; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H9498-9499)
11/29/2017-2:22pmHouseRule H. Res. 631 passed House.
11/28/2017-6:53pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 631 Reported to House. The rules provides 1 hour of general debate on both bills. For H.R. 3017, the bill is closed to amendments. For H.R. 3905, the rule provides for a specified amendment. The rule also provides for one motion to recommit with or without instructions on each bill.
11/21/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 312.
11/21/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-422.
11/08/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 17 - 13.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
11/08/2017HouseSubcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged.
11/08/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
11/08/2017HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
11/07/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
10/05/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
10/05/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
10/02/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
10/02/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 10/02/2017
Rep. Lewis, Jason [R-MN-2]* 10/02/2017
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 10/05/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources10/02/2017 Referred to
11/07/2017 Markup by
11/08/2017 Markup by
11/21/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-422
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources10/05/2017 Referred to
11/08/2017 Discharged from
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands10/05/2017 Referred to
11/08/2017 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources12/01/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3905. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (11/30/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Minnesota's Economic Rights in the Superior National Forest Act

(Sec. 2) This bill declares that minerals with the National Forest System (NFS) lands in Minnesota shall not be subject to withdrawal from disposition under U.S. mineral and geothermal leasing laws unless such withdrawal is approved by an Act of Congress.

(Sec. 3) The bill prohibits any extension or establishment of national monuments on NFS lands in Minnesota except by express authorization of Congress.

(Sec. 4) The bill declares that certain mineral leases issued within the exterior boundaries of NFS lands in Minnesota are indeterminate preference right leases that shall be: (1) issued for an initial 20-year period; and, (2) after such period, shall be renewable for 10-year periods if the lessee has complied with the terms and conditions of the lease during the 20-year period and on the condition that, at the end of each 10-year renewal period, Interior may readjust lease terms and conditions to encourage production or to address changing conditions within the lease area.

Interior may: (1) suspend operations under a lease when the lease can only be operated at a loss due to market conditions or when operations are interrupted by strikes; and (2) issue permits for the use of surface lands subject to, but not included in, the lease for the exploration, development, and use of the deposits covered by the lease.

This bill applies to all such mineral leases within the exterior boundaries of NFS lands in Minnesota, including: (1) leases that are not effective as of enactment of this bill; and (2) the existing hard rock mineral leases for Superior National Forest identified as MNES-01352 and MNES-01353.

The National Environmental Policy Act of 1969 (NEPA) shall also apply to all such mineral leases within those boundaries. In the case of the renewal of such hard rock mineral leases, the Bureau of Land Management must complete the pending environmental assessment under NEPA within 30 days of this bill's enactment.