There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Risk-Based Credit Examination Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Risk-Based Credit Examination Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Risk-Based Credit Examination Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 with respect to risk-based examinations of Nationally Recognized Statistical Rating Organizations.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/07/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 389 - 32 (Roll no. 615).(text: CR H8545-8546)
11/03/2017Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-384.
10/02/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
11/08/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
11/07/2017-6:30pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/07/2017-6:30pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 389 - 32 (Roll no. 615). (text: CR H8545-8546)
11/07/2017-6:24pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8581)
11/07/2017-2:23pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
11/07/2017-2:08pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3911.
11/07/2017-2:07pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8545-8547)
11/07/2017-2:07pmHouseMr. Huizenga moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/03/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 281.
11/03/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-384.
10/12/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 60 - 0.
10/12/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
10/11/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
10/02/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
10/02/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 10/02/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services10/02/2017 Referred to
10/12/2017 Markup by
11/03/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-384
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs11/08/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3911.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.3911. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (11/07/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

Risk-Based Credit Examination Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 to provide the Securities and Exchange Commission's Office of Credit Ratings with discretion concerning reviewable matters during its annual examination of nationally recognized statistical rating organizations.