There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Stop Online Ammunition Sales Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require face-to-face purchases of ammunition, to require licensing of ammunition dealers, and to require reporting regarding bulk purchases of ammunition.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
10/04/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
01/22/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
10/04/2017Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/04/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/04/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 10/04/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 10/04/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 10/04/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 10/04/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 10/04/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 10/04/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 10/04/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 10/04/2017
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 10/04/2017
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 10/04/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 10/04/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 10/04/2017
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 10/04/2017
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 10/04/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 10/04/2017
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 10/04/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 10/04/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 10/04/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 10/04/2017
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 10/04/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/04/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 10/04/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 10/04/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 10/04/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 10/11/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 10/11/2017
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/11/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/11/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 10/26/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 10/26/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/19/2018
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/19/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/19/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 03/19/2018
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/24/2018
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 06/21/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary10/04/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations01/22/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3962.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3962. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/04/2017)

Stop Online Ammunition Sales Act of 2017

This bill establishes new requirements and restrictions with respect to the sale, purchase, shipment, and transport of ammunition.

Among other things, the bill does the following:

  • requires an ammunition dealer to be licensed,
  • requires ammunition sales to be conducted in person, and
  • requires a licensed ammunition importer, manufacturer, or dealer to report on bulk sales of ammunition.