There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

STRANDED Act of 2017
Sensible, Timely Relief for America's Nuclear Districts' Economic Development Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To assist communities affected by stranded nuclear waste, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
10/05/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
10/06/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/05/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/05/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/05/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 10/25/2017
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 11/01/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/02/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce10/05/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment10/06/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means10/05/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3970. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/05/2017)

Sensible, Timely Relief for America's Nuclear Districts' Economic Development Act of 2017 or the STRANDED Act of 2017

This bill requires the Department of Energy (DOE) to enter into an arrangement under which the National Academy of Sciences must conduct a study to determine whether opportunities exist for affected communities to consider alternatives to nuclear facilities, generating sites, and waste sites. DOE must also: (1) establish the Stranded Nuclear Waste Task Force to study existing public and private resources and funding for affected communities, and (2) establish a grant program to assist localities near nuclear power plants to offset the impacts of stranded nuclear waste in affected communities.

The bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to provide for tax incentives for investment in nuclear affected communities.