There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Community Institution Mortgage Relief Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Community Institution Mortgage Relief Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Community Institution Mortgage Relief Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Truth in Lending Act and the Real Estate Settlement Procedures Act of 1974 to modify the requirements for community financial institutions with respect to certain rules relating to mortgage loans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/12/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 294 - 129 (Roll no. 675).(text: CR H9799)
11/30/2017Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-432.
10/05/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (25)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/13/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
12/12/2017-5:11pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/12/2017-5:11pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 294 - 129 (Roll no. 675). (text: CR H9799)
12/12/2017-5:03pmHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 190 - 233 (Roll no. 674).
12/12/2017-4:37pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9828-9830)
12/12/2017-1:38pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Titus motion to recommit, the Chair put the question on passage of the motion to recommit, and by voice vote announced that the noes had prevailed. Ms. Titus demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the motion to recommit until later in the legislative day.
12/12/2017-1:37pmHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
12/12/2017-1:29pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Titus motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment adding a new section pertaining to Protecting Consumers from Excessive Housing Costs and Predatory Lenders.
12/12/2017-1:29pmHouseMs. Titus moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Financial Services. (text: CR H9807)
12/12/2017-1:28pmHouseH.Amdt.497 On agreeing to the Sherman amendment (A002) Agreed to by voice vote.
12/12/2017-1:28pmHouseH.Amdt.497 The previous question was ordered on the amendment and the bill pursuant to the rule.
12/12/2017-1:23pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 647, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Sherman amendment No. 1.
12/12/2017-1:22pmHouseH.Amdt.497 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Sherman. (consideration: CR H9806-9807; text: CR H9806)
12/12/2017-12:22pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3971.
12/12/2017-12:20pmHouseProvides for consideration of H.R. 477 and H.R. 3971 under structured rules with one hour of debate, one motion to recommit with or without instructions on each measure. Also provides for consideration of H.J.Res. 123 under a closed rule, with one hour of debate and one motion
12/12/2017-12:20pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 647. (consideration: CR H9799-9808)
12/06/2017-4:57pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 647 Reported to House. Provides for consideration of H.R. 477 and H.R. 3971 under structured rules with one hour of debate, one motion to recommit with or without instructions on each measure. Also provides for consideration of H.J.Res. 123 under a closed rule, with one hour of debate and one motion
11/30/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 319.
11/30/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-432.
10/12/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 41 - 19.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
10/12/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
10/11/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
10/05/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
10/05/2017HouseIntroduced in House
09/07/2017HouseHearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Introduction and Referral.
Action By: House Financial Services Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 10/05/2017
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 10/05/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/23/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 11/30/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services10/05/2017 Referred to
10/12/2017 Markup by
11/30/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-432
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit09/07/2017 Hearings by
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs12/13/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.3971. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (12/12/2017)

Community Institution Mortgage Relief Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Truth in Lending Act to create a safe harbor from requirements for an escrow or impound account for the payment of taxes and hazard insurance in the case of mortgage loans made by a creditor with consolidated assets of $10 billion or less that holds the loan on its balance sheet for three years after its origination.

A creditor shall be deemed to have complied with the three-year balance sheet requirement if it transfers a loan by reason of its bankruptcy or failure, the purchase of it by another, or by a supervisory act or recommendation from a state or federal regulator.

The Consumer Financial Protection Bureau is required to exempt mortgage servicers that service 20,000 or fewer mortgage loans from requirements of the Real Estate Settlement Procedures Act of 1974 pertaining to the servicing of mortgage loans and administration of escrow accounts.