There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Keep America's Refuges Operational Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Keep America's Refuges Operational Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Keep America's Refuges Operational Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Keep America's Refuges Operational Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Keep America's Refuges Operational Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Fish and Wildlife Act of 1956 to reauthorize the volunteer services, community partnership, and refuge education programs of the National Wildlife Refuge System, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
04/23/2018Became Public Law No: 115-168. (TXT | PDF)
04/23/2018Signed by President.
04/11/2018Presented to President.
04/09/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S2017)
12/18/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 371 - 14 (Roll no. 687).(text: CR H10154)
12/05/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-438.
10/05/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber
04/23/2018Became Public Law No: 115-168. (TXT | PDF)
04/23/2018Signed by President.
04/11/2018HousePresented to President.
04/10/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/09/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2017)
12/19/2017SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
12/18/2017-7:15pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/18/2017-7:15pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 371 - 14 (Roll no. 687). (text: CR H10154)
12/18/2017-7:07pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10166)
12/18/2017-5:22pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/18/2017-5:12pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3979.
12/18/2017-5:12pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10154-10155)
12/18/2017-5:11pmHouseMr. Wittman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
12/05/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 324.
12/05/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-438.
11/30/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
11/30/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
11/29/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
11/29/2017HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
11/15/2017HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands
10/12/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
10/11/2017HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H7959)
10/05/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
10/05/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources10/05/2017 Referred to
11/30/2017 Markup by
12/05/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-438
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands10/12/2017 Referred to
11/15/2017 Hearings by
11/29/2017 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.3979. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-168 (04/23/2018)

Keep America's Refuges Operational Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Fish and Wildlife Act of 1956 to reauthorize through FY2022: (1) the volunteer services, community partnerships, and refuge education programs of the National Wildlife Refuge System; and (2) provisions authorizing the Department of the Interior to accept and use gifts, devises, or bequests of real and personal property for the benefit of the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service in the performance of its activities and services.